# Quantitative Aptitude Practice Test for SBI PO Prelims

QUANTITATIVE APTITUDE PRACTICE TEST
(APPROXIMATION)
Directions(1-10): What approximate value should come in place of the question mark (?) in the following questions? (You are not expected to calculate the exact value).

1) 459% of 849.947 + 266% of 6284.012 - 1486.002 = ?
a)20330
b)12640
c)15000
d)22160
e)19130

2) 4433.764 - 2211.993 - 1133.667 + 3377.442 = ?
a)4466
b)4377
c)3633
d)4144
e)3344

3) 2439.97 - 1234.01 + 401.99 = ? + 989.99
a)620
b)650
c)680
d)700
e)600

4) 89.988% of 699.9 + 50.002% of 999.99 - 170.015 = ?
a)990
b)900
c)920
d)960
e)860

5) 6999 ÷ 70.005 × 94.998 = ? × 19.999
a)475
b)420
c)320
d)540
e)525

6) 39.897% of 4331 + 58.779% of 5003 = ?
a)4200
b)4600
c)4700
d)4800
e)5200

7) 34% of 576 + 18% of 842 = ?% of 400 + 83.4
a)75
b)72
c)62
d)65
e)66

8) 11989 - 27.95 × 14.98 × 11.05 - ? = 2800
a)4850
b)4380
c)4580
d)5580
e)None of these

9) 158.25 × 4.6 + 21% of 847 + ? = 950.93
a)35
b)40
c)25
d)50
e)45

10) 39.05 × 14.95 - 27.99 × 10.12 = (36 + ?) × 5
a)22
b)29
c)34
d)32
e)25

1.e)
2.a)
3.a)
4.d)
5.a)
6.c)
7.e)
8.c)
9.e)
10.e)

Solution
1.459% of 849.947 + 266% of 6284.012 - 1486.002
≈ (460 × 850)/100 + (260 × 6280)/100 - 1486
≈ 3910 + 16328 - 1486
≈ 18752
This can be treated approximate to 19130.

2.4433.764 - 2211.993 - 1133.667 + 3377.442
≈ 4434 - 2212 - 1134 + 3377
≈ 4465
≈ 4466

3.2439.97 - 1234.01 + 401.99 = ? + 989.99
or, 2440 - 1234 + 402 ≈ ? + 990
or, 1608 ≈ ? + 990
or, ? ≈ 618
or, ? ≈ 620

4.89.988% of 699.9 + 50.002% of 999.99 - 170.015
≈ (700 × 90)/100 + (1000 × 50)/100 - 170
≈ 630 + 500 - 170
≈ 960

5.6999 ÷ 70.005 × 94.998 = ? × 19.999
or, 7000 ÷ 70 × 95 ≈ ? × 20
or, ? ≈ (7000 × 95)/(70 × 20)
or, ? ≈ 867
or, ? ≈ 870

6.39.897% of 4331 + 58.779% of 5003
≈ (4330 × 40)/100 + (5000 × 59)/100
≈ 1732 + 2950
≈ 4682
≈ 4700

7.34% of 576 + 18% of 842 = ?% of 400 + 83.4
or, (34 × 576)/100 + (18 × 842)/100 = (400 × ?)/100 + 83.4
or, 195.84 + 151.56 = 4 × ? + 83.4
or, 347.4 = 4 × ? + 83.4
or, 4 × ? = 347.4 - 83.4 = 264
or, ? = 264/4 = 66

8.11989 - 27.95 × 14.98 × 11.05 - ? = 2800
or, 12000 - 28 × 15 × 11 - ? = 2800
or, 7380 - ? = 2800
or, ? = 4580

9.158.25 × 4.6 + 21% of 847 + ? = 950.93
or, 727.95 + 0.21 × 847 + ? = 950.93
or, 727.95 + 177.87 + ? = 950.93
or, ? = 45.11
or, ? = 45 (approx)

10.39.05 × 14.95 - 27.99 × 10.12 = (36 + ?) × 5
or, 39 × 15 - 28 × 10 = (36 + ?) × 5
or, 585 - 280 = (36 + ?) × 5
or, 305/5 = 36 + ?
or, ? = 61 - 36
or, ? = 25 (approx)
Study Materials and Important Notifications